IL SB2606 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-12)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that each State agency entering into or maintaining a contract for the purchase of food under the Code shall adopt a policy that permits the donation of leftover food procured by State funds. Provides that the policy shall address any daily food operations run by the agency, including one-time events, and shall contain a list of nearby soup kitchens, food pantries, and other non-profit organizations where leftover food can be donated. Requires each State agency to circulate its policy to all agency employees, and submit its food donation policy to the Department of Central Management Services on an annual basis beginning December 31, 2018. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCURE-FOOD DONATION POLICY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-02-27SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050055-20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback