IL SB2604 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Uniform Penalty and Interest Act. Provides that the penalty for failure to pay the tax shown due or required to be shown due on a return shall be 15% (instead of 20%) of any amount that is paid after the date the Department of Revenue has initiated an audit or investigation of the taxpayer. Provides that the penalty shall be abated if the taxpayer paid to the Department at least 95% of the total tax liability (including any additional liability resulting from the audit or investigation) prior to the initiation of the audit or investigation. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
UPIA-FAILURE TO FILE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 005-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 735 | 3-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 735 | 3-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |