IL SB2603 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Music Therapy Licensing and Practice Act. Provides for licensure of music therapists by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Establishes the powers and duties of the Department, including prescribing rules defining what constitutes an appropriate curriculum for music therapy, reviewing the qualifications of applicants for licenses, investigating alleged violations of the Act, conducting hearings on disciplinary and other matters, and establishing a schedule of fees for the administration and enforcement of the Act. Establishes qualifications for licensure as a music therapist. Provides that a music therapist shall collaborate with other professionals when applicable in providing music therapy services. Provides that licenses issued under the Act shall be renewed biennially. Establishes the Music Therapy Advisory Committee. Establishes the powers and duties of the advisory committee, including advising the Department on all matters pertaining to licensure, education, and continuing education requirements for music therapists. Establishes grounds for discipline of a license. Provides for civil and criminal penalties for violations of the Act. Creates provisions concerning formal hearings, including transcripts of proceedings, appointment of hearing officers, subpoenas and depositions, and rehearings. Provides for judicial review of all final administrative decisions of the Department. Preempts home rule. Effective immediately.
Title
MUSIC THERAPY LICENSING
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] |
Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2603&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2603.htm |