IL SB2600 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a person incarcerated on a bailable offense who does not post bail shall be allowed a credit of $30 (rather than $5) for each day incarcerated.
Title
CRIM PRO-INCARCERATION CREDIT
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 110-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2600&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2600.htm |