IL SB2599 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that mandatory consecutive sentencing for a person charged with a felony who commits a separate felony while on pretrial release or in pretrial detention in a county jail facility or county detention facility, or for a person admitted to bail following conviction of a felony who commits a separate felony while free on bond, shall not apply to a person who knowingly violates a condition of electronic monitoring or a home detention program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CORRECTIONS-SENTENCING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-018-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 007-002-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73055-8-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback