IL SB2594 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Police Act. Authorizes a civilian employee of the Department of State Police who is not a State policeman to be a truck weighing inspector with the power of enforcing a provision to issue in his or her discretion, upon application and good cause a special permit authorizing the applicant to operate or move a vehicle or combination of vehicles of a size or weight of vehicle or load exceeding the maximum permitted under the Illinois Vehicle Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE POLICE-TRUCK INSPECTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20261018Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback