IL SB2593 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that before a township may submit a proposition or referendum to abolish a road district under the Code, the township shall prepare, through an independent entity, a cost study demonstrating that the abolishment is cost efficient. Provides that if a cost study finds that the abolishment is not cost efficient, the township may not submit a proposition. Defines "independent entity". Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HGHWY CD-ABOLISH ROAD DISTRICT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
2018-04-26SenateTabled By Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Government Reform
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Reform
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-04-04SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 009-000-000
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-02-28SenatePostponed - Government Reform
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - Government Reform
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60556-134Amended CodeCitation Text
60556-135Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback