IL SB2591 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0598
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wind Energy Facilities Agricultural Impact Mitigation Act. Provides that the Act may be cited as the Renewable Energy Facilities Agricultural Impact Mitigation Act. Changes references in the Act from "commercial wind energy facility" to "commercial renewable energy facility". Provides that "commercial renewable energy facility" means a commercial wind energy facility or commercial solar energy facility. Defines "commercial solar energy facility". Provides that for commercial renewable energy facility owners of a commercial solar energy facility, the agricultural impact mitigation agreement shall be entered into prior to the commercial renewable energy facility owner making contact with a landowner seeking an underlying agreement for the development of a commercial solar energy facility. Makes conforming changes in the Counties Code and the Illinois Municipal Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGR-RENEWABLE ENERGY FACILITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0598
2018-06-29SenateEffective Date June 29, 2018
2018-06-29SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-26SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Energy Committee; 008-000-000
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-22HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Energy Committee
2018-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-05-10HouseArrived in House
2018-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bennett
2018-05-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 008-000-000
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-09SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 007-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5051471Amended CodeCitation Text
50514710Amended CodeCitation Text
50514715Amended CodeCitation Text
5051475Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-12020Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-13-26Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback