IL SB2591 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act and the State Finance Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health may designate a hospital as a STEMI Receiving Center or a STEMI Referring Center. Defines "STEMI" as a ST-elevated myocardial infarction. Provides certain requirements for designation as a STEMI Receiving Center or STEMI Referring Center. Establishes a State Acute Cardiac Advisory Council. Establishes Regional Acute Cardiac Subcommittees within each Regional EMS Advisory Committee. Provides that the Regional Acute Cardiac Subcommittees shall develop protocols concerning patients with STEMI. Creates the Acute Cardiac Event Data Collection Fund and provides that the moneys in the fund shall be used to support the collection of certain data and provides that any surplus fund shall be used to support the salary of the Department Stroke and Acute Cardiac Event Coordinator or for certain other purposes. In a provision concerning the Stroke Data Collection Fund, provides that any surplus funds shall be used by the Department to support the salary of the Department Stroke and Acute Cardiac Event Coordinator (instead of the Department Stroke Coordinator) or for certain other purposes. Contains provisions concerning definitions; rulemaking; annual fees for designation as a STEMI Receiving Center; suspension and revocation of a hospital's STEMI Receiving Center designation; and reporting of certain data. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2017.
Title
EMS-STEMI CENTERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 50 | 3.117.75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.121.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 50 | 3.121.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 50 | 3.121.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 50 | 3.121.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 50 | 3.121.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 50 | 3.121.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 50 | 3.121.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 50 | 3.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.875 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2591&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2591.htm |