IL SB2590 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. Provides a minimum fine is $25. Provides when any defendant is convicted, pleads guilty, or placed on court supervision for a violation of a law or local ordinance, the court shall order one schedule of assessments in the case plus any conditional assessment applicable to a conviction in the case, as set forth in the Act, for the defendant to pay in addition to any fine, restitution, or forfeiture ordered by the court. Provides all money collected by the clerk of the court based on the schedules or conditional assessments shall be remitted to the appropriate treasurer as directed in the Act. Provides the treasurers shall deposit the money as indicated in the ordered schedule or conditional assessment. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a defendant may petition the court for full or partial waiver of court assessments imposed under the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. Provides the court shall grant a full or partial waiver of court assessments if specified conditions are met. Makes corresponding and conforming changes to various Acts and Codes. Repeals various laws. Effective July 1, 2019, except for certain provisions that are effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FEES - FINES - ASSESSMENTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2013103.2Amended CodeCitation Text
20141010Amended CodeCitation Text
2026107.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2039309.1Amended CodeCitation Text
301056b-4Amended CodeCitation Text
301056z-82Amended CodeCitation Text
301056z-87Amended CodeCitation Text
301058pAmended CodeCitation Text
301058qAmended CodeCitation Text
306057cAmended CodeCitation Text
507059Amended CodeCitation Text
507059.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
5553-4012Repealed CodeCitation Text
5553-6023Amended CodeCitation Text
5554-2002Repealed CodeCitation Text
5554-2002.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
5554-2004Amended CodeCitation Text
5554-2005Amended CodeCitation Text
5554-2006Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1101Repealed CodeCitation Text
5555-1101.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
5555-1103Repealed CodeCitation Text
625511-1002.5Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-501.01Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-605Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-605.1Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-605.3Amended CodeCitation Text
625515-113Amended CodeCitation Text
625516-104aRepealed CodeCitation Text
625516-104bRepealed CodeCitation Text
625516-104cRepealed CodeCitation Text
625516-104dRepealed CodeCitation Text
625516-104d-1Repealed CodeCitation Text
625516-105Amended CodeCitation Text
62552-120Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-118Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.1aRepealed CodeCitation Text
70510527.1bNew CodeSee Bill Text
70510527.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
70510527.2aRepealed CodeCitation Text
70510527.2bAmended CodeCitation Text
70510527.3Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.3aRepealed CodeCitation Text
70510527.3cRepealed CodeCitation Text
70510527.3eRepealed CodeCitation Text
70510527.3gRepealed CodeCitation Text
70510527.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
70510527.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
70510527.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
7054055-915Amended CodeCitation Text
7059515Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-3.4Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-30Amended CodeCitation Text
72055010.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
720570411.2Amended CodeCitation Text
720570411.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
72064680Amended CodeCitation Text
72064690Amended CodeCitation Text
72524010Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124A-20New CodeSee Bill Text
73012517Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4-3Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-50Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-55Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-60Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-65Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-75Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-80Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-3Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-6Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-6-1Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-6-3Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-6-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-7-1Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.1-5Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.10Repealed CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.11Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.12Repealed CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.14Repealed CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.15Repealed CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.16Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.17Repealed CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.18Repealed CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.19Repealed CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.20Repealed CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.21Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.4Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.7Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.9Amended CodeCitation Text
73555-105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback