IL SB2590 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. Provides a minimum fine is $25. Provides when any defendant is convicted, pleads guilty, or placed on court supervision for a violation of a law or local ordinance, the court shall order one schedule of assessments in the case plus any conditional assessment applicable to a conviction in the case, as set forth in the Act, for the defendant to pay in addition to any fine, restitution, or forfeiture ordered by the court. Provides all money collected by the clerk of the court based on the schedules or conditional assessments shall be remitted to the appropriate treasurer as directed in the Act. Provides the treasurers shall deposit the money as indicated in the ordered schedule or conditional assessment. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a defendant may petition the court for full or partial waiver of court assessments imposed under the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. Provides the court shall grant a full or partial waiver of court assessments if specified conditions are met. Makes corresponding and conforming changes to various Acts and Codes. Repeals various laws. Effective July 1, 2019, except for certain provisions that are effective July 1, 2018.
Title
FEES - FINES - ASSESSMENTS
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |