IL SB2589 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-13 - Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Eastern Illinois Economic Development Authority Act. Adds Livingston and McLean counties to the jurisdiction of the Authority. Amends the Quad Cities Regional Economic Development Authority Act. Adds Winnebago, Stark, and Ogle counties to the jurisdiction of the Authority. Also adds Jo Daviess, Carroll, Whiteside, Stephenson, and Knox counties to provisions concerning additional powers and duties of the Authority. Amends the Southeastern Illinois Economic Development Authority Act. Expands the jurisdiction of the Authority to include all of Washington County (rather than Irvington Township in Washington County). Amends the Southwestern Illinois Economic Development Authority Act. Adds Monroe County to the jurisdiction of the Authority. Also adds Bond and Clinton counties to provisions concerning powers of the Authority. Amends the Upper Illinois River Valley Development Authority Act. Adds Boone and DeKalb counties to the jurisdiction of the Authority. Also adds Kendall, Kane, Lake, and McHenry counties to provisions concerning duties and acquisitions of the Authority. In the various Acts, makes conforming changes to board sizes, the number of board members to constitute a quorum, the number of board members needed to perform official acts, board powers and duties, and an election of a board chairperson. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGIONAL DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 52 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-13SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-11-13SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018
2018-11-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-11-09SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-08-23SenateGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-25SenateSent to the Governor
2018-06-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 041-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 041-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2018
2018-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-05-31SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-052-000
2018-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-30HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-27HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7050615Amended CodeCitation Text
7050620Amended CodeCitation Text
7050645Amended CodeCitation Text
7051014Amended CodeCitation Text
705104Amended CodeCitation Text
705107Amended CodeCitation Text
7051820Amended CodeCitation Text
7051845Amended CodeCitation Text
705204Amended CodeCitation Text
705205Amended CodeCitation Text
705208Amended CodeCitation Text
705304Amended CodeCitation Text
705305Amended CodeCitation Text
705308Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2589&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2589.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2589eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2589enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2589gms.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2589sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2589sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2589ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2589ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2589_04262018_085000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2589_05312018_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2589ham002_05312018_068001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2589ham001_05312018_068000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback