IL SB2589 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0512
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0512
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Requires the Director of Insurance to forward certain information to the National Association of Insurance Commissioners. Establishes new governance standards that must be met by existing risk retention groups within one year after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Establishes governance standards concerning boards of directors, independent directors, service provider contracts, adopting certain written policies, audit committees, disclosure, business conduct and ethics, and reporting noncompliance. Requires risk retention groups to submit copies of material revisions to their plans of operation or feasibility studies within 30 days after the date of the approval of the revisions. Exempts purchasing groups meeting certain federal requirements from additional laws concerning insurance.
Title
INS CD-RISK RETENTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0512 |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2016-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Muñoz |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 123B-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 123B-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 123B-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 123B-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |