IL SB2588 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Deletes language repealing the Healthy Local Food Incentives Program on June 30, 2019.
Title
DHS-HEALTHY LOCAL FOOD PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 12-4.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2588&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2588.htm |