IL SB2587 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Telehealth Act. Provides that "health care professionals" includes dentists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TELEHEALTH ACT-DENTIST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-04-20HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-04-20HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-04-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-04-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2251505Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback