IL SB2580 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Probation and Probation Officers Act. Provides that the appointment of officers to probation or court services departments under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 and the Pretrial Services Act shall be in accordance with the provisions of the Act (rather than only the Juvenile Court Act of 1987).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROBATION-PRETRIAL SERVICES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-03-13HouseArrived in House
2018-03-13SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73011013aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback