IL SB2579 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0929
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that the Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts shall study the fiscal impact of the implementation of Public Act 100-285, dealing with expungement and confidentiality processes for delinquent minors, (rather than Public Act 90-590) upon probation departments. Provides that the Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts may submit a report of that study to the General Assembly within 12 months after the enactment of the amendatory Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-REPORT ON FISCAL IMPACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0929
2018-08-17SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 051-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-29SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Mulroe
2018-04-17SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-03-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054051-18Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2579&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2579.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2579eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2579enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0929.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2579sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2579sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2579ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2579ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2579ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2579_04252018_004000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2579_05302018_030000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2579ham003_05312018_043000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback