IL SB2579 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0929
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0929
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that the Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts shall study the fiscal impact of the implementation of Public Act 100-285, dealing with expungement and confidentiality processes for delinquent minors, (rather than Public Act 90-590) upon probation departments. Provides that the Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts may submit a report of that study to the General Assembly within 12 months after the enactment of the amendatory Act.
Title
JUV CT-REPORT ON FISCAL IMPACT
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] |
Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. Juliana Stratton [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0929 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 051-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Mulroe |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 1-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |