IL SB2578 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to exempt from electronic visit verification requirements all live-in caregivers who provide personal care services under the Adults with Developmental Disabilities waiver and the Support Waiver for Children and Young Adults with Developmental Disabilities. Defines "live-in caregiver" and permits the Department to adopt any rules necessary to implement the amendatory Act, including rules on the form and manner in which a caregiver must verify that he or she meets the definition of "live-in caregiver". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-LIVE-IN CAREGIVER WAIVER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07SenateSession Sine Die
2024-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2024-05-26HouseCommittee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2024
2024-05-24HouseCommittee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2024
2024-05-03HouseCommittee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
2024-04-18HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
2024-04-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-04-17HouseFirst Reading
2024-04-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2024-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
2024-04-09HouseArrived in House
2024-04-09SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-018-000
2024-03-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2024
2024-03-22SenateSecond Reading
2024-03-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 22, 2024
2024-03-21SenateDo Pass as Amended Health and Human Services; 008-000-000
2024-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2024-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
2024-03-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
2024-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2024-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner
2024-01-24SenateAssigned to Health and Human Services
2023-05-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-05-09SenateFirst Reading
2023-05-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-47New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback