IL SB2578 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0794
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Cook County Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that if a person certified by a medical doctor to be under legal disability (i) has no spouse, blood relative, or other person providing or caring for him or her, (ii) has no guardian of his or her estate, and (iii) is confined to a Medicare approved, State certified nursing home or to a publicly owned and operated nursing home, hospital, or mental institution, the Board may pay any benefit due that person to the nursing home, hospital, or mental institution, to be used for the sole benefit of the person under legal disability. Provides that the payment to a person, nursing home, hospital, or mental institution for the benefit of a minor or person under legal disability shall be an absolute discharge of the Fund's liability with respect to the amount so paid. Requires any person, nursing home, hospital, or mental institution accepting that payment to notify the Fund of the death or any other relevant change in the status of the minor or person under legal disability. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-COOK-PAYEE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0794
2018-08-10SenateEffective Date August 10, 2018
2018-08-10SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-001
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 014-000-000
2018-05-09HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-09HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe
2018-04-17SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000
2018-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4059-228Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback