IL SB2577 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Use Tax Act and the Service Use Tax Act. Provides that, if a retailer or serviceman makes a sale to purchaser in Illinois from outside of Illinois, then that retailer or serviceman is considered to be "maintaining a place of business in this State" if (1) the cumulative gross receipts from sales of service to purchasers in Illinois are $150,000 or more; or (2) the retailer or serviceman enters into 200 or more separate transactions for sales of service to purchasers in Illinois. Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Marketplace Fairness Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

USE/OCC TX-BUSINESS IN STATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-010-001
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 005-000-000
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - Revenue
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-02-15SenateChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351052Amended CodeCitation Text
351102Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback