IL SB2572 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that the State Board of Elections shall work with election authorities and the disability community to develop and implement procedures and technologies to provide vote by mail ballots, upon request, in alternative formats that allow all voters to cast a secret, independent, and verifiable vote by mail ballot without the assistance of another person. Requires the procedures and technologies to include an accessible electronic ballot marking tool that enables voters to mark their ballots privately and independently. Provides that the State Board of Elections and election authorities shall work to implement other methods for voters to return the ballot to the election authority when completed that shall conform to certain standards. Requires that each election authority provide the option of a fully electronic ballot with both electronic marking and electronic return that allows voters having a disability to vote a secret ballot without assistance by January 1, 2023.
Title
ELEC CD-DISABILITY/BALLOTS
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | To Executive- Elections |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2572&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2572.htm |