IL SB2572 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that an approved waiver from or modification to a physical education mandate may remain in effect for a period not to exceed 2 school years (rather than 5 school years like other mandate waivers) and may be renewed no more than 2 times upon application by an eligible applicant. Provides that an approved waiver from or modification to a physical education mandate may be changed within the 2-year period by the school board or regional superintendent of schools, whichever is applicable, following the procedure set forth in the Code for the initial waiver or modification request. Provides that a school board may determine the schedule or frequency of physical education courses, provided that an elementary school pupil engage in a course of physical education for a minimum of 150 minutes per week and a high school pupil engage in a course of physical education for a minimum of 225 minutes per week (rather than engaging in a course of physical education for a minimum of 3 days per 5-day week). Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-PHYSICAL EDUCATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-17SenatePostponed - Education
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Education
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Education
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.25gAmended CodeCitation Text
105527-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback