IL SB2572 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-4)
Status: Vetoed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-13 - Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Linda Holmes
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that an approved waiver from or modification to a physical education mandate may remain in effect for a period not to exceed 2 school years (rather than 5 school years like other mandate waivers) and may be renewed no more than 2 times upon application by an eligible applicant. Provides that an approved waiver from or modification to a physical education mandate may be changed within the 2-year period by the school board or regional superintendent of schools, whichever is applicable, following the procedure set forth in the Code for the initial waiver or modification request. Provides that a school board may determine the schedule or frequency of physical education courses, provided that an elementary school pupil engage in a course of physical education for a minimum of 150 minutes per week and a high school pupil engage in a course of physical education for a minimum of 225 minutes per week (rather than engaging in a course of physical education for a minimum of 3 days per 5-day week). Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-PHYSICAL EDUCATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-13SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-11-13SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018
2018-08-19SenateGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 062-044-000
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-24HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-007-000
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-04HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-014-001
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-24SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 008-005-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-04-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-17SenatePostponed - Education
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Education
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Education
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.25gAmended CodeCitation Text
105527-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback