IL SB2566 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Eminent Domain Act. Provides that quick-take proceedings may be used for a period of no more than one year after the effective date by the Cicero Public School District 99 in Cook County for the acquisition of certain described property for the purpose of early childhood schools. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

QUICK-TAKE: CICERO PUB SCHOOLS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-30HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2016-11-30HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2016-11-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-000-000
2016-11-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2016-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2016-11-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2016-11-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-15HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
2016-11-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2016-11-15HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner
2016-11-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2016-11-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2016-11-09HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2016-06-30HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
2016-05-27HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
2016-05-13HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
2016-05-02HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2016-04-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-04-21HouseFirst Reading
2016-04-21HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2016-04-21HouseArrived in House
2016-04-20SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2016-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2016
2016-04-14SenateSecond Reading
2016-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
2016-04-06SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 012-000-000
2016-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2016-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2016-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2016-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2016-03-08SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2016-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2016-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2016-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7353025-65New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback