IL SB2564 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that the Chief Judge of the Circuit Court of a county may decide not to implement a provision by local court rule that requires a person charged with an offense to be allowed counsel at the hearing at which bail is determined and if the defendant desires counsel for his or her initial appearance but is unable to obtain counsel, the court shall appoint a public defender or licensed attorney at law of this State to represent him or her for purposes of that hearing. Provides that the Chief Judge of the Circuit Court of a county may decide not to implement a provision requiring that a person in custody for a Category B offense due to an inability to post monetary bail be brought before the court at the next available court date or 7 calendar days from the date bail was set, whichever is earlier, for a rehearing on the amount or conditions of bail or release pending further court proceedings. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-OPT OUT BAIL REFORM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenateTo Subcommittee on Bail Reform
2018-04-04SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255109-1Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback