IL SB2563 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides for a credit against withholding taxes in an amount equal to 25% of the wages or salary paid by a private employer to an Illinois employee while the employee is on organ donation leave if the employer grants all of its employees the option of taking a paid leave of absence of at least 30 days for the purpose of serving as an organ donor or bone marrow donor. Provides that the credit may not exceed $20,833.33 for each employee who takes organ donation leave. Provides that such a leave of absence must be taken without loss of pay, vacation time, compensatory time, personal days, or sick time for at least the first 30 days of the leave of absence. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-ORGAN DONATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-10-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-09-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-09-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355704AAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback