IL SB2562 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom from Drone Surveillance Act. Provides an exemption to the Act for a law enforcement agency that is using a drone to prepare for or monitor safety and security at a large-scale event, if drone usage is limited to legitimate public safety purposes, including, but not limited to, evaluating crowd size, density, or movement, assessing public safety vulnerabilities or weaknesses, determining appropriate staffing levels for law enforcement or other public safety personnel, or identifying possible criminal activity. Defines "large-scale event". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DRONE USE-LARGE EVENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 74 N: 35 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Extended Debate - Passed 074-035-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Extended Debate
2018-05-30HouseRemoved from Standard Debate Status
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Not Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-001-000
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-002-000
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-25HouseMotion Prevailed
2018-05-25HouseMotion - Move to Previous Question Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-05-25HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-25HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-05-23HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-05-23HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2018-05-23HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2018-05-22HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-05-22HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2018-05-18HousePension Note Filed
2018-05-18HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2018-05-18HouseJudicial Note Filed
2018-05-18HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-17HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-17HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-17HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-17HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-17HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-17HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-17HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-17HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-17HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-002-006
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-24SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-001
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-17SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72516715Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback