IL SB2561 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that no person may acquire or possess any pre-packaged explosive components within this State without having in his or her possession a Firearm Owner's Identification Card previously issued in his or her name by the Department of State Police. Provides exemptions. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits unlawful sale or delivery of pre-packaged explosive components when he or she knowingly sells or gives pre-packaged explosive components to a person who is disqualified under the Firearm Owner's Identification Card Act; sells or transfers pre-packaged explosive components to a person who does not display to the seller or transferor of the pre-packaged explosive components a currently valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card that has previously been issued in the transferee's name by the Department of State Police under the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act; or sells or gives pre-packaged explosive components while engaged in the business of selling pre-packaged explosive components at wholesale or retail without being licensed as a federal firearms dealer under the federal Gun Control Act of 1968. Provides that any person who is convicted of unlawful sale or delivery of pre-packaged explosive components commits a Class 4 felony. Defines "pre-packaged explosive components". Makes other changes. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PREPACKAGE EXPLOSIVE COMPONENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2018-04-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-03-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-20HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-03-13HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-03-13HouseArrived in House
2018-03-13SenateThird Reading - Passed; 042-006-000
2018-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430651Amended CodeCitation Text
430651.1Amended CodeCitation Text
430652Amended CodeCitation Text
430653Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-4.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback