IL SB2560 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0927
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that persons engaged in the activity of publishing on a website or in print criminal record information must remove the information free of charge within 30 days after a request by the subject of the information. Sets forth qualifications under which a person who is subject to the criminal record information is eligible for the removal of the information. Provides that failure to comply with a request for removal constitutes an unlawful practice. (Current law prohibits the solicitation of payment to remove criminal record information.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLISHING CRIMINAL RECORDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0927
2018-08-17SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-17SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-050-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-002-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Stadelman
2018-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-004-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8155052QQQAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2560&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2560.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2560eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2560enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0927.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2560sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2560sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2560sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2560sam004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2560sam005.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2560_04252018_001000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2560_05302018_003000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback