IL SB2559 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0926
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Provides that, beginning with the 2019-2020 academic year, the Board of Higher Education shall develop a 3-year education loan information pilot program for use by each public institution of higher education that enrolls students who are eligible to receive financial aid. Defines "education loan". Provides that the program shall require that each public institution of higher education that receives education loan information for a student enrolled at the institution provide annually to the student or the parent or guardian of the student certain information relating to the education loans. Provides that a public institution of higher education is not liable for any representations made during the pilot program. Repeals the provision on June 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDU LOAN INFO PILOT PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0926
2018-08-17SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-17SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 018-000-000
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-001-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Higher Education; 013-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2018-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11020514New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback