IL SB2557 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that whenever the appearance in person in court, in either a civil or criminal proceeding, is required of anyone held in a place of custody or confinement operated by the State or any of its political subdivisions, including counties and municipalities, the chief judge of the circuit by rule may permit the personal appearance to be made by means of two-way audio-visual communication, including closed circuit television and computerized video conference at a sentencing hearing for a defendant who at the time of the proceeding was serving a sentence of imprisonment for another offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-VIDEO CONFERENCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-17HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-001
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 008-001-000
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255106D-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback