IL SB2556 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Repeals an Article governing the suspension of a person's driver's license for nonpayment of child support or failure to comply with a visitation order. Makes corresponding changes in the Non-Support Punishment Act, Illinois Parentage Act of 2015, Illinois Public Aid Code, Supreme Court Act, Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act, and Clerks of Courts Act. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-CHILD SUPPORT REPEAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 10-17.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | Ch. 7 Art. VII | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
705 | 105 | 27.1b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 16 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 46 | 805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 607.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2556&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2556.htm |