IL SB2556 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Condominium Property Act. Provides that certain attorney's fees shall be excluded from the demand given under specified provisions of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that in any litigation or arbitration between a unit owner and the association or its board of managers or any individual member of the association or its board of managers regarding specified disputes, if the unit owner is deemed by the court or arbitrator to be the substantially prevailing party, then the court or the arbitrator shall award to the unit owner from the non-prevailing party reasonable attorney's fees and costs incurred by the unit owner in the litigation or arbitration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONDOMINIUM ACT-ATTORNEY FEES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-17HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules
2018-05-16HouseRemains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-05-16HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-004-000
2018-05-16HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-05-16HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-001-000
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy
2018-05-09HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 031-017-002
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-001-001
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7656059.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback