IL SB2555 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall (rather than to the extent resources permit, the Department shall) provide child care services to specified persons. Expands the list of categories of families and children (rather than families) the Department shall cover to include: (i) families that are not recipients of TANF benefits and that need child care assistance to participate in education and training activities; (ii) children engaged in the State's child welfare system; and (iii) homeless children. Provides that beginning in State fiscal year 2017, the specified threshold must be no less than 300% of the then-current federal poverty level for each family size (rather than through and including fiscal year 2007, the specified threshold must be no less than 50% of the then-current State median income for each family size; and beginning in fiscal year 2008, the specified threshold must be no less than 185% of the then-current federal poverty level for each family size). Requires the Department to provide child care services to all children who are eligible for assistance and are under age 13 or who are under age 19 and under court supervision or have physical or mental incapacities as documented by a statement from a local health provider or other health professional. Effective July 1, 2016.
Title
CHILD CARE-INCOME THRESHOLD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 005-002-000 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 9A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2555&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2555.htm |