IL SB2547 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-REIMBURSEMENT RATES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-016-000
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 006-003-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-04SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205051.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback