IL SB2547 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
DCFS-REIMBURSEMENT RATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-05-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-016-000 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 006-003-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |