IL SB2546 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Provides that the term "student" within the definition of "educational employee" or "employee" as used in the Act includes (rather than excludes) graduate students who are teaching assistants primarily performing duties that involve the delivery and support of instruction and all other graduate students. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDU LABOR ACT-EMPLOYEE DEFN

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenateTotal Veto Stands
2018-11-13SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018
2018-08-24SenateGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-30HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Extended Debate - Passed 066-049-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Extended Debate
2018-05-30HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-05-30HouseHome Rule Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-30HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-29HousePension Note Filed
2018-05-29HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2018-05-29HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2018-05-29HouseJudicial Note Filed
2018-05-29HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2018-05-29HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2018-05-28HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-28HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-28HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-28HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-28HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-28HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-28HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-28HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-22HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-05-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-21HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 015-010-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-20HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-19HouseArrived in House
2018-04-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 034-019-000
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Labor; 010-004-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-02-28SenatePostponed - Labor
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Labor
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2018-02-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11552Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback