IL SB2544 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Vetoed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Local Government Reduction and Efficiency Division of the Counties Code. Provides that the findings on an audit of a unit that has been proposed to be dissolved shall be reported within 30 days, or as soon thereafter as is practicable, (rather than 30 days) after the chairman of the board requests the audit. Provides that a county board may adopt an ordinance authorizing the dissolution of a unit not less than 60 days (rather than 150 days) following the court's appointment of a trustee-in-dissolution (rather than after the effective date of the ordinance). Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVERNMENT REDUCTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenateBill Dead - Amendatory Veto
2018-11-13SenateMotion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Terry Link
2018-11-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 14, 2018
2018-08-27SenateGovernor Amendatory Veto
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-06-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 045-005-001
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 009-004-001
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-29SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-035-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-05-25HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-25HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-25HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-25HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 010-000-000
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee
2018-03-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-13HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-03-13HouseArrived in House
2018-03-13SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-02-21SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 009-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5555-44025Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback