IL SB2543 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mosquito Abatement District Act. Provides that upon a majority vote of the board of trustees of a mosquito abatement district in favor of a proposition to annex or consolidate with another mosquito abatement district, a municipality, or a county, and if the governing authorities of the governmental unit assuming the functions of the former district agree by resolution to accept the functions (and jurisdiction over the territory, if applicable) of the consolidated or annexed mosquito abatement district, then the mosquito abatement district shall cease. Provides that on the effective date of the annexation or consolidation, all of the rights, powers, duties, assets, liabilities, indebtedness, obligations, bonding authority, taxing authority, and responsibilities of the district vests in and is assumed by the governmental unit assuming the former district's functions. Provides for the rights of the employees of the former district once the former district is consolidated into the other governmental unit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MOSQUITO DIST-CONSOLIDATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-001-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-04-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-20HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-20HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-19HouseArrived in House
2018-04-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; T. Cullerton
2018-04-17SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Government Reform; 009-000-000
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Reform
2018-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 008-000-000
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70100511.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback