IL SB2543 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0793
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0793
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mosquito Abatement District Act. Provides that upon a majority vote of the board of trustees of a mosquito abatement district in favor of a proposition to annex or consolidate with another mosquito abatement district, a municipality, or a county, and if the governing authorities of the governmental unit assuming the functions of the former district agree by resolution to accept the functions (and jurisdiction over the territory, if applicable) of the consolidated or annexed mosquito abatement district, then the mosquito abatement district shall cease. Provides that on the effective date of the annexation or consolidation, all of the rights, powers, duties, assets, liabilities, indebtedness, obligations, bonding authority, taxing authority, and responsibilities of the district vests in and is assumed by the governmental unit assuming the former district's functions. Provides for the rights of the employees of the former district once the former district is consolidated into the other governmental unit.
Title
MOSQUITO DIST-CONSOLIDATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0793 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-001-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; T. Cullerton |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Government Reform; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Reform |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Government Reform; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Government Reform |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |