IL SB2542 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. In the Article governing children with disabilities, provides that, amongst other meanings, a "school psychologist" means a person who holds a valid Nationally Certified School Psychologist credential (rather than certificate). Removes from the definition of "school psychologist" the requirement that a psychologist have additional qualifications as may be required by the State Board of Education. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SCH PSYCHOLOGIST DEFN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 14-1.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2542&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2542.htm |