IL SB2541 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With respect to age-appropriate developmental screening and age-appropriate social and emotional screening, provides that the Department of Public Health must, no later than January 1, 2019, develop rules and appropriate revisions to the Child Health Examination form in conjunction with various organizations. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-DEPT PUBLIC HEALTH-RULE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-030-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-002-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-001-000
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Public Health; 007-002-000
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-8.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback