IL SB2540 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that during the period beginning September 1 of the year of a general election and ending the day after the general election, the proper name or image of any executive branch constitutional officer or member of the General Assembly shall not be included in a public announcement on behalf of an executive branch constitutional officer, member of the General Assembly, or State agency related to any contract or grant awarded by a State agency. Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that appropriated funds may only be expended during the fiscal year for which they were appropriated. Provides that if any State agency receives a grant or contract from itself from appropriated funds, the recipient agency shall be restricted in the expenditure of these funds to the period during which the grantor agency was so restricted. Amends the Illinois Grant Funds Recovery Act. Provides that the Governor's Office of Management and Budget shall convene a subcommittee of the Illinois Single Audit Commission to provide recommendations to the General Assembly regarding the adoption of legislation. Amends the Grant Accountability and Transparency Act. Sets forth provisions concerning the stop payment system. Modifies a Section concerning the adoption of supplemental rules by the Governor's Office of Management and Budget. Modifies a Section concerning the annual report submitted by the Governor's Office of Management and Budget. Provides requirements for awarded grants. Sets forth provisions concerning the travel costs incurred by the employees of the recipient or subrecipient of an awarded grant. Requires nonprofit organizations to maintain State grant funds in an account which is separate from non-grant funds. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVT ETHICS-STOP PAYMENT ORDER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Barickman
2018-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Government Reform; 007-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Reform
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 008-000-000
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Government Reform
2018-04-04SenatePostponed - Government Reform
2018-02-28SenatePostponed - Government Reform
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - Government Reform
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1540528New CodeSee Bill Text
2030052.11New CodeSee Bill Text
2030052.12New CodeSee Bill Text
3010525Amended CodeCitation Text
3010535Amended CodeCitation Text
3070515.5New CodeSee Bill Text
30708105New CodeSee Bill Text
30708110New CodeSee Bill Text
30708115New CodeSee Bill Text
30708120New CodeSee Bill Text
30708125New CodeSee Bill Text
30708130New CodeSee Bill Text
3070815Amended CodeCitation Text
3070825Amended CodeCitation Text
3070850Amended CodeCitation Text
30708520New CodeSee Bill Text
3070855Amended CodeCitation Text
3070895Amended CodeCitation Text
54305-20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback