IL SB2540 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Home Repair and Remodeling Act. Provides that any person who suffers actual damage as a result of a violation of the Act may bring an action pursuant to the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Eliminates language making it unlawful for any person engaged in the business of home repairs and remodeling to remodel or make repairs or charge for remodeling or repair work before obtaining a signed contract or work order over $1,000 and before notifying and securing the consumer's signed acceptance or rejection of the binding arbitration clause and the jury trial waiver clause as required under the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
HOME REPAIR & REMOD-VIOLATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1023 | |
2010-07-12 | Effective Date July 12, 2010 | |
2010-07-12 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-15 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-15 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2010-04-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2010-04-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2010-04-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-13 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-13 | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 008-000-000 | |
2010-04-07 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2010-03-22 | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi | |
2010-03-10 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2010-03-09 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2010-02-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2010 | |
2010-02-18 | Second Reading | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 18, 2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to Judiciary | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-12 | First Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |