IL SB2536 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on December 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-01 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on December 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-01 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires all non-relative providers in the child care assistance program for the first time to participate in comprehensive orientation and pre-service trainings covering health and safety matters appropriate to a home-based setting within 6 months after the non-relative provider begins providing services under the child care assistance program. Provides that non-relative providers shall be paid $15 per hour for their attendance and time spent at mandatory orientation and pre-service trainings and that there shall be no charge for non-relative providers to attend mandatory orientation and pre-service trainings. Provides that relative providers shall be encouraged, but not required, to attend orientation and pre-service trainings, and shall be paid the same amount as non-relative providers. Requires orientations to be offered in person, no less than 6 times per year in each service delivery area; and requires the Department of Human Services to provide orientations and pre-service trainings in reasonably convenient locations and to provide reasonable advance notice. Requires the State to contribute into a Taft-Hartley health fund for the purpose of providing health insurance to qualified home child care providers. Provides that for State fiscal year 2017, the rate shall be $587.69 per enrollee per month; and that for future fiscal years, the rate shall be adjusted as determined by actuarial analysis. Effective July 1, 2016.
Title
CHILD CARE PROVIDERS-TRAININGS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-16 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2016-11-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2016-11-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 038-019-000 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 16, 2016 |
2016-07-22 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 068-043-001 |
2016-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2016-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2016-05-13 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2016-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2016-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-008-000 |
2016-05-12 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2016-05-11 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2016-05-10 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-05-09 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2016-05-06 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-05-03 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2016-05-03 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2016-05-02 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2016-05-02 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2016-05-02 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-018-000 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-002-000 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 005-001-000 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |