IL SB2535 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARM OWNERS ID ACT-REPEAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
2020-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2020-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2020-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2020-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2020-02-04SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2020-02-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2020-02-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2020-01-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-01-28SenateFirst Reading
2020-01-28SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.6Amended CodeCitation Text
105510-27.1AAmended CodeCitation Text
105534-8.05Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-120Repealed CodeCitation Text
2026052605-300Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-45Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-595Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-610Repealed CodeCitation Text
20260555a in partAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a-5Amended CodeCitation Text
20261017bAmended CodeCitation Text
2026302.2Amended CodeCitation Text
20805805-538Amended CodeCitation Text
2252102005Amended CodeCitation Text
22544735-30Amended CodeCitation Text
22544735-35Amended CodeCitation Text
301056z-99Amended CodeCitation Text
40556-103.1Amended CodeCitation Text
40556-103.2Amended CodeCitation Text
40556-103.3Amended CodeCitation Text
410452Amended CodeCitation Text
43065ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
43066105Amended CodeCitation Text
4306625Amended CodeCitation Text
4306630Amended CodeCitation Text
4306640Amended CodeCitation Text
4306670Amended CodeCitation Text
4306680Amended CodeCitation Text
4306735Amended CodeCitation Text
4306740Amended CodeCitation Text
430685-20Amended CodeCitation Text
430685-25Amended CodeCitation Text
430685-40Amended CodeCitation Text
430685-85Amended CodeCitation Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
583010-5Amended CodeCitation Text
507101Amended CodeCitation Text
507257.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
52053.2Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.2aAmended CodeCitation Text
62552-116Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-3.05Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-4Amended CodeCitation Text
720516-0.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720516C-2Amended CodeCitation Text
720517-30Amended CodeCitation Text
72052-7.1Amended CodeCitation Text
72052-7.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1.6Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1.8Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-2Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3.2Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3.4Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3BAmended CodeCitation Text
720524-4.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-4.5New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-9Amended CodeCitation Text
72064610Amended CodeCitation Text
7255102-7.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-10Amended CodeCitation Text
7255112A-11.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7255112A-11.2Amended CodeCitation Text
7255112A-14Amended CodeCitation Text
7255112A-14.7Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-110Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-3Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-3.2Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-6-3Amended CodeCitation Text
74011012Amended CodeCitation Text
7402180Amended CodeCitation Text
75060210Amended CodeCitation Text
75060214Amended CodeCitation Text
76510251Amended CodeCitation Text
765102615-705Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback