IL SB2533 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions and Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Except for persons who elected to establish certain alternative credits, moves provisions concerning Tier 2 members of IMRF from the General Provisions Article to the IMRF Article. Defines Tier 1 regular employee and Tier 2 regular employee. Provides that the increase to the retirement annuity of a Tier 1 regular employee shall be computed from the effective date of the retirement annuity, the first increase being 0.25% (instead of .167%) of the monthly amount times the number of months from the effective date to January 1. Provides that if the employee was a Tier 1 regular employee, the surviving spouse annuity shall be increased by an amount equal to (i) 3% of the original amount thereof if the deceased employee was receiving a retirement annuity at the time of his or her death; otherwise (ii) 0.25% (instead of 0.167%) of the original amount thereof for each complete month that has elapsed since the date the annuity began. Makes other changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement.
Title
PEN CD-IMRF-TIER 2
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 012-000-000 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.44 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-109.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 7-109.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 7-114 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-141 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-141.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-142 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-144 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-156 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2533&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2533.htm |