IL SB2533 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Provides that invoices submitted under the Act shall be posted on the State Comptroller's website. Provides that each such invoice shall indicate which provision of the contract or subcontract has been submitted for payment and the amount due. Provides that, upon payment, the invoice number and the voucher number shall be posted on the State Comptroller's website. Provides that the State Comptroller may enter into an intergovernmental agreement with the City of Chicago for the purpose of collecting and posting that information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BUSINESS ENTERPRISE-POSTING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018
2018-05-03SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government
2018-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-04-19SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-04-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government
2018-04-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-04SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-03-01SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305758kNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback