IL SB2531 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with changes. Provides that provisions concerning pass-through entities apply only with respect to taxable years for which a specified limitation on individual deductions applies under the Internal Revenue Code. Adds a corresponding addition modification. Makes a conforming change with respect to the Local Government Distributive Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-APPORTIONMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2021-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2021-05-27SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000
2021-05-25SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
2021-05-21SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-21SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Win Stoller
2021-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2021
2021-05-21SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2021-05-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2021-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-001-000
2021-05-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
2021-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2021-04-28HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2021-04-28HouseArrived in House
2021-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Stoller
2021-04-21SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2021-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Win Stoller
2021-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
2021-04-15SenateDo Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
2021-04-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2021-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Win Stoller
2021-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2021-03-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-03-23SenateAssigned to Revenue
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
2021-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Win Stoller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3551501Amended CodeCitation Text
355201Amended CodeCitation Text
355203Amended CodeCitation Text
355601Amended CodeCitation Text
355709.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2531&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2531.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2531eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2531enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2531sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2531sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2531ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2531_04212021_068000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB2531_05202021_029000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2531ham001_05302021_044000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback